Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Zhao You-min (Chao Yong Ming)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1909²Born
1936²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 1958³49.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China
8 Mar 198879.1DiedBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zhao You-min (Chao Yong Ming)
Bishop Zhao You-min (Chao Yong Ming) (born 1909, died ) Bishop of Jinzhou [Jehol]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopJinzhou, Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]
Death PlaceShenyang, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 13
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast