Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Antaki

Deceased

Protosyncellus Emeritus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Nubia

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1927BornLe Caire
2 Jul 195023.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 196841.6AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
9 Sep 196841.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nubia
1 Dec 196841.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nubia
1992²64.9AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
1998²70.9AppointedProtosyncellus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
1998²70.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 200174.4RetiredProtosyncellus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
29 Dec 201184.9DiedProtosyncellus Emeritus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Antaki:
Archbishop Paul Antaki (born , died ) Protosyncellus Emeritus of Egypt and Sudan

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015