Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Zeng Jing mu, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yujiang [Yükiang], China

Member of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1919¹Born
25 Mar 194929.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 1990³70.4Ordained BishopBishop of Yujiang [Yükiang], China
2000²80.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
Apr 2014³94.6RetiredBishop of Yujiang [Yükiang], China
2 Apr 201696.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Yujiang [Yükiang], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Zeng Jing mu
Bishop Thomas Zeng Jing mu O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yujiang [Yükiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZengjiacun
Death PlaceFuzhou

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 1,141
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • op/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast