Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanase Ach-Chaer, B.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1897Born
21 Sep 191922.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
28 Jul 195153.8AppointedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
7 Oct 195154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
18 Nov 196467.1AppointedArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
2 Nov 198487.1RetiredArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
28 Feb 199395.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Athanase Ach-Chaer
Archbishop Athanase Ach-Chaer B.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaloula

  • a priest for 73.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018