Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Wyvill

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1330AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
15 Jul 1330Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
14 Sep 1375DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Wyvill:
Bishop Robert Wyvill (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 600
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013