Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Trilleck

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1344AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 1344ConfirmedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
29 Aug 1344Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 1360DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Trilleck:
Bishop John Trilleck (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 462

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013