Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Northburgh

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jan 1322AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 1322Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
13 Dec 1358DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger Northburgh:
Bishop Roger Northburgh (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013