Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Montacute

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Dec 1333AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
8 May 1334Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
14 Mar 1337AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
20 Jun 1345DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon Montacute
Bishop Simon Montacute (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238, and Page 529
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 334
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast