Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard FitzRalph

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1346AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
8 Jul 1347Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
14 Nov 1360DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Richard FitzRalph:
Archbishop Richard FitzRalph (died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014