Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Wolfradt

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1581BornKöln
15 Feb 163149.5SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
26 May 163149.8ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
3 Aug 163150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
1 Apr 163957.7DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Anton Wolfradt:
Bishop Anton Wolfradt (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015