Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Bernhard von Galen

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1606Born
14 Nov 165044.0SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
22 May 165144.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
Aug 1651³44.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 165144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
19 Sep 167871.9DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Bernhard von Galen
Bishop Christoph Bernhard von Galen (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRinkerode

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018