Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Frick

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cardicium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598Born
162628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
14 Nov 164446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
14 Nov 164446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
2 Apr 164547.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
13 Mar 165557.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Frick (VIAF: 8528046)
Bishop Bernhard Frick (born 1598, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeck

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,645, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast