Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Pauli-Stravius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹Born
25 Mar 162734.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 164047.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
26 Mar 164047.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
17 Feb 164148.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
7 Feb 166168.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georgius Pauli-Stravius
Bishop Georgius Pauli-Stravius (born 1593, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLozzen Cuttecoven, Belgium

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast