Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich Adolf von der Reck

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1601BornKurl
14 Apr 162927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
3 Nov 165049.3SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 May 165149.8ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
1 Oct 165150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 Jan 166159.6DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrich Adolf von der Reck:
Bishop Dietrich Adolf von der Reck (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015