Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Kelly, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Freetown and Bo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1900BornNewhaven, Great Britain
17 Jun 192827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
18 May 193736.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
18 May 193736.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
24 Aug 193737.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
18 Apr 195049.8AppointedArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
12 Feb 195251.6DiedArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Kelly:
Archbishop Ambrose Kelly C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop of Freetown and Bo

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015