Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Virgilio

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1868Born
23 May 189122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Venosa, Italy
15 Apr 191041.6AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
22 May 191041.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
27 Jan 192354.4DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Virgilio
Bishop Emanuele Virgilio (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenosa

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast