Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues de Labatut

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornVillelongue
3 Dec 164058.9AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
27 Jan 164159.0Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
10 Feb 164462.1DiedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues de Labatut:
Bishop Hugues de Labatut (died ) Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Mar 2015