Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvat d’Iharse

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1602AppointedBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Jun 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
7 Oct 1648DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for Salvat d’Iharse
Bishop Salvat d’Iharse (died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017