Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverino Buonomo

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1748³Born
19 Sep 177224.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181869.7SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
24 May 181869.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
25 May 181869.9ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
1827¹78.5DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverino Buonomo
Bishop Francesco Saverino Buonomo (born , died 1827) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaeta, Diocese of Gaeta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,818, Number 53
  • ob/c2+: AT, 17 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,731

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast