Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Longobardi

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1755BornNapoli
22 Jun 177722.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 181863.6SelectedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
21 Dec 181863.9ConfirmedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Jan 181963.9Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
23 Mar 181964.1InstalledBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
19 Apr 182267.2AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
23 Sep 182267.6DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Longobardi:
Bishop Raffaele Longobardi (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 68, and Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013