Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosi de Magistris

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1757Born
20 May 178022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Oct 181861.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Oct 181861.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
1 Nov 181861.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
1820¹62.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrosi de Magistris
Bishop Ambrosi de Magistris (born , died 1820) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast