Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Manso Zuñiga y Sola

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587BornCañas, Spain
9 Aug 162740.6AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
12 Apr 162841.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
20 Jul 163447.6ResignedArchbishop of México, Federal District
5 Oct 163750.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cartagena (en España)
8 Oct 164053.8AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
27 Dec 165569.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Manso Zuñiga y Sola:
Archbishop Francisco de Manso Zuñiga y Sola (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,634
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 124, and Page 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 151, Number 961

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014