Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristofor Segni

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornBologna
24 Apr 164541.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
11 Feb 164642.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
8 Jul 166157.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristofor Segni:
Archbishop Cristofor Segni (died ) Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 335
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013