Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele (Rafaele) Todde Valeri, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1789Born
21 Jan 180818.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
23 Jan 181424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
8 Jan 184858.0SelectedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
14 Apr 184858.3ConfirmedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
6 May 184959.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
22 Dec 185161.9DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele (Rafaele) Todde Valeri
Bishop Michele (Rafaele) Todde Valeri Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanuova
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ales, Diocese of Ales e Terralba

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast