Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Montixi

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1798³BornCagliari
18 Feb 182628.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 184345.0SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
25 Jan 184445.9ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
16 Jun 184446.3Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
26 Feb 188486.0DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Montixi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Montixi (born , died ) Bishop of Iglesias

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 255
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013