Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Vargiù

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1792³Born
26 Dec 181927.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 182027.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 184249.3SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
22 Jul 184249.7ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
30 Nov 184250.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
3 Aug 186673.7DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vargiù
Bishop Pietro Vargiù (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsili

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 386
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast