Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Utrera

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1741Born
23 Feb 180159.2AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
7 Jun 180159.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
27 Dec 180867.0DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Utrera
Bishop Francisco Javier Utrera (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTartanedo

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,801, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 120, Number 634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast