Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Edward Untener

Deceased

Bishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1937Born
1 Jun 196325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
4 Oct 198043.1AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
24 Nov 198043.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
27 Mar 200466.6DiedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Edward Untener
Bishop Kenneth Edward Untener (born , died ) Bishop of Saginaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast