Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Ubeda Gramage

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1931BornOnteniente
26 Jun 195523.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 197038.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibiza, Spain
1 Sep 197038.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
1 Nov 197039.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
13 Apr 197341.5AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 May 200371.6DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Ubeda Gramage:
Bishop Teodoro Ubeda Gramage (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013