Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Planas Muntaner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ibiza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1904Born
19 Mar 192722.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 196055.7AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
29 May 196055.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
10 Sep 197672.2ResignedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
15 Jun 198580.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ibiza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Planas Muntaner
Bishop Francisco Planas Muntaner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ibiza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast