Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Alexandre de Tovar

Deceased

Prelate of Goiás, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Titiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1744Born
13 Jun 176723.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 180359.2AppointedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
20 Jun 180359.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
28 Aug 180359.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
8 Oct 180864.5DiedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente Alexandre de Tovar
Bishop Vicente Alexandre de Tovar (born , died ) Prelate of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBahia

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast