Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim de Meneses e Ataide, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1765BornPorto
16 Nov 178823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
29 Aug 180438.9SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
29 Oct 180439.1ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
12 May 180539.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
29 May 182054.7AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
5 Nov 182863.1DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim de Meneses e Ataide:
Bishop Joaquim de Meneses e Ataide O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 186, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013