Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Stefano Cardinal Donghi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608BornGenoa
13 Jul 164335.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164335.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
27 Nov 165143.9AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
12 May 165244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
14 May 165547.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
2 Aug 165547.6AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
26 Feb 166355.2AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
26 Nov 166961.9DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stefano Donghi:
Cardinal Giovanni Stefano Donghi (died ) Bishop of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
  • a cardinal for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 209, and Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013