Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Filonardi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aquino

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582²BornBauco
24 Nov 160826.8AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
28 Dec 160826.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Italy
17 Aug 161129.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jul 161432.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
18 May 161533.3ResignedBishop of Aquino, Italy
29 Sep 162240.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Aquino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Filippo Filonardi:
Filippo Cardinal Filonardi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aquino

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 45, Number 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1608, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015