Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lanfranco Cardinal Margotti

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558BornParma
24 Nov 160850.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 160850.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
26 Jan 160951.1AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
15 Feb 160951.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
11 Jan 161052.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
28 Nov 161153.9DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lanfranco Margotti:
Cardinal Lanfranco Margotti (died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Nov 1608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013