Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Juan Tomé

Deceased

Bishop of Mercedes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1914BornBuenos Aires
16 Apr 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Jul 196349.0AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
15 Sep 196349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
25 Sep 198167.2DiedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Juan Tomé:
Bishop Luis Juan Tomé (born , died ) Bishop of Mercedes

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013