Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano Cabras

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sassari

Titular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1840BornBessude
12 Mar 186423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sassari, Italy
17 Dec 190060.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sassari, Italy
17 Dec 190060.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
9 Jun 190161.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
19 Oct 190565.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Cabras:
Bishop Giuliano Cabras (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sassari

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 167
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013