Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Todaro, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1752Born
23 Dec 177522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
18 Sep 180754.7AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
7 Feb 180855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
10 Jul 181663.5SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
22 Jul 181663.5ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
21 Apr 182168.3DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Todaro
Bishop Silvestro Todaro O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,808, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 241, and Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast