Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maximos Salloum

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1920Born
20 Jul 194625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
20 Aug 197554.7AppointedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
14 Sep 197554.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
23 Jul 199776.6RetiredArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
28 Oct 200483.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Maximos Salloum
Archbishop Maximos Salloum (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYaroun

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast