Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cyrille VIII Geha

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1840BornAlep
3 May 188544.4AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 May 188544.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Jun 190261.6SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Jun 190261.6SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Jun 190362.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Jun 190362.6ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
10 Jan 191675.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Cyrille VIII Geha:
Patriarch Cyrille VIII Geha (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013