Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Wojna Orański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1697³BornWłodzimierz
23 Dec 171922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Feb 172023.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 173033.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
18 Dec 173033.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
1731¹33.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
4 Feb 177881.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Adam Wojna Orański:
Bishop Adam Wojna Orański (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015