Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Joaquín Matías Suárez, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Titular Bishop of Amyzon

Titular See: (1802, appointed by King, but not confirmed for Huesca)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1744Born
20 Dec 180258.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
20 Dec 180258.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
20 Feb 180358.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
2 May 183187.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Joaquín Matías Suárez
Bishop Miguel Joaquín Matías Suárez O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantander

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 123, Number 652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast