Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Orlton

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1317AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
22 May 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 1327AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
1 Dec 1333AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
18 Jul 1345DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Adam Orlton:
Bishop Adam Orlton (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274, and Page 529
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 461
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 13, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013