Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Haymo Hethe

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Mar 1317SelectedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Aug 1319Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
4 May 1352DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Haymo Hethe:
Bishop Haymo Hethe (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 422
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 562

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013