Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Bichi

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1596BornSiena
5 May 162831.5AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
7 May 162831.6Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
29 May 162831.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
8 Jun 163033.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
6 Sep 163033.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
9 Sep 163033.9AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
28 Nov 163337.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 163437.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
7 Dec 163741.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
25 May 165760.6DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Bichi (VIAF: 29808682)
Alessandro Cardinal Bichi (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
  • a cardinal for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 24, and Page 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 27
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 254
  • ob/c2: AT, 9 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016