Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Vari

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1693BornSpoleto
10 Jan 171723.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 173945.9AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
10 May 173945.9Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
12 Oct 174855.3DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Vari:
Bishop Bernardino Vari (died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015