Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel González y Virtus

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹BornAstudillo, Spain
19 Aug 170839.6SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
6 May 170940.3ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Sep 170940.6Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
18 Jan 171041.0DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel González y Virtus:
Bishop Manuel González y Virtus (born 1669, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,861
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,819
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015