Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Cano y Tevar, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornValdemoro
167025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
4 Jul 169550.5AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
25 Sep 169550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
17 Jan 171469.0AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
20 Apr 171974.3DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julián Cano y Tevar:
Bishop Julián Cano y Tevar O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 66, and Page 399
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 238, Number 1,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014