Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathieu Sislian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Ammaedara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1843BornMarasc
28 Aug 190158.7SelectedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
8 Sep 190158.7ConfirmedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
21 Nov 190158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
3 Dec 190966.9ResignedBishop of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey
3 Dec 190966.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
30 Aug 191572.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cesarea di Cappadocia (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Mathieu Sislian:
Bishop Mathieu Sislian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesarea di Cappadocia

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 167
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013