Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Blaze (Blaes), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹Born
14 Apr 159757.2AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
23 Nov 159757.8Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
14 Mar 160161.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
21 Mar 161878.2DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Blaze (Blaes) (VIAF: 296298027)
Bishop Jacques Blaze (Blaes) O.F.M. (born 1540, died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruges
Ordained BishopSte Elisabeth, Bruxelles
Death PlaceSaint-Omer, Diocese of Saint-Omer

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100, and Page 251
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast